EP2194162 - Use of a coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovent e.V. Prüssingstrasse 27b 07745 Jena / DE | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schimanski, Arnd Altonaer Strasse 13 99085 Erfurt / DE | 02 /
Grünler, Bernd Kirchstrasse 14 07937 Zeulenroda / DE | 03 /
Pfuch, Andreas Louis-Braille-Strasse 16 99510 Apolda / DE | 04 /
Heft, Andreas Florian-Geyer-Strasse 7 07545 Gera / DE | 05 /
Polster, Martin Paul-Scharf-Strasse 17 07952 Pausa / DE | [2010/45] |
Former [2010/32] | 01 /
Schimanski, Arnd Im Schellenkai 64 44329, Dortmund / DE | ||
02 /
Grünler, Bernd Kirchstrasse 14 07937 Zeulenroda / DE | |||
03 /
Pfuch, Andreas Louis-Braille-Strasse 16 99510 Apolda / DE | |||
04 /
Heft, Andreas Florian-Geyer-Strasse 7 07545 Gera / DE | |||
05 /
Polster, Martin Paul-Scharf-Strasse 17 07952 Pausa / DE | |||
Former [2010/23] | 01 /
Schimanski, Arnd Im Schellenkai 64 44329, Dortmund / DE | Representative(s) | Liedtke, Markus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Straße 10/11 99096 Erfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Liedtke, Markus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 10-11 99096 Erfurt / DE | ||
Former [2010/23] | Liedtke, Markus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Elisabethstraße 10 99096 Erfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 09178044.5 | 04.12.2009 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | DE20081060923 | 06.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008060923 | [2010/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2194162 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2194162 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2194162 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/513, C23C16/40 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
C23C16/513 (EP);
C23C16/401 (EP);
C23C16/453 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Schicht | [2010/23] | English: | Use of a coating | [2010/23] | French: | Utilisation d'une couche | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 26.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2009 | BG | 15.10.2014 | CY | 15.10.2014 | CZ | 15.10.2014 | DK | 15.10.2014 | EE | 15.10.2014 | ES | 15.10.2014 | FI | 15.10.2014 | HR | 15.10.2014 | IT | 15.10.2014 | LT | 15.10.2014 | LV | 15.10.2014 | MC | 15.10.2014 | MK | 15.10.2014 | MT | 15.10.2014 | NL | 15.10.2014 | PL | 15.10.2014 | RO | 15.10.2014 | SE | 15.10.2014 | SI | 15.10.2014 | SK | 15.10.2014 | SM | 15.10.2014 | TR | 15.10.2014 | IE | 04.12.2014 | LU | 04.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | GB | 15.01.2015 | NO | 15.01.2015 | GR | 16.01.2015 | IS | 15.02.2015 | PT | 16.02.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 04.12.2009 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.12.2009 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 04.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 04.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 15.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]DE102007025151 (INNOVENT E V [DE]) [XD] 1 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0043] , [0044]; claims 1,13,14 * [I] 2-15; | [XDI]DE102007025152 (INNOVENT E V [DE]) [XD] 1 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0046] , [0047]; claims 1,17,18 * [I] 2-15 |