EP2202696 - Vehicle health monitoring architecture for diagnostics and prognostics as a service in an e-enterprise [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramanathan, Jijji Patent Services M/S AB/2B Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Mylaraswamy, Dinkar Patent Services M/S AB/2B Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Nwadiogbu, Emmanuel Obiesie Patent Services M/S AB/2B Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 04 /
Iyer, Vidhyashankaran Ramamoorthy Patent Services M/S AB/2B Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 05 /
Menon, Sunil Patent Services M/S AB/2B Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 06 /
Uluyol, Onder Patent Services M/S AB/2B Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09178128.6 | 04.12.2009 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | US20080340161 | 19.12.2008 Original published format: US 340161 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2202696 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2202696 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
G07C5/006 (EP,US);
G07C5/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugzustandsüberwachungsarchitektur für Diagnosen und Prognosen als Dienstleistung in einem elektronischen Unternehmen | [2010/26] | English: | Vehicle health monitoring architecture for diagnostics and prognostics as a service in an e-enterprise | [2010/26] | French: | Architecture de surveillance de l'état d'un véhicule pour le diagnostic et pronostic en tant qu'entretien dans une e-entreprise | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 26.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 02.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007112488 (AVERY ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 2-8 *; | [A]US2006004499 (TREGO ANGELA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0037]; figure - *; | [A]US2004260777 (KOLB KURT [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 1-4,8 * | by applicant | US2007112488 |