EP2199040 - Cutter apparatus and method for shearing reinforced fabrics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vargo, Richard David 2259 Cross Creek Trail Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44223 / US | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 09178156.7 | 07.12.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | US20080335716 | 16.12.2008 Original published format: US 335716 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2199040 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2199040 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/24, B26D1/00, B29D30/46 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
B26D1/245 (EP,US);
B26D1/0006 (EP,US);
B26D3/005 (EP,US);
B26D2001/0066 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7797 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schneidevorrichtung und Verfahren zum Scheren von verstärktem Gewebe | [2010/25] | English: | Cutter apparatus and method for shearing reinforced fabrics | [2010/25] | French: | Appareil de découpe et procédé de cisaillement de tissus renforcés | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2011 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR1501727 (KLÉBER S.A. [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,8-15 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1-6 * [I] 6; | [XI]DE1579091 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) [X] 1,2,4,8-15 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1-5 * [I] 6; | [A]US3783926 (DE ZARAUZ Y) [A] 8,10 * cord diameter d of the order of 3 mm; column 1, line 5 - line 55 *; | [A]US5688597 (KOHNO MASATSUGU [JP]) [A] 8,10 * 3 to 7 filaments w diameter from 0.2 to 0.4 mm; column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 22; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2002134481 (ABDALLAH DAVID G [US]) [A] 8,10* cords diameter 0.3 to 2.0 mm; paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2006150794 (KIM JONG-HOON [KR], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0052]; figures 6-10 * | by applicant | FR1501727 | DE1579091 |