EP2165895 - Motion control apparatus for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advics Co., Ltd 2-1, Asahi-machi, Kariya-city Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2013/36] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Advics Co., Ltd 2-1, Asahi-machi, Kariya-city Aichi 448-8650 / JP | ||
For all designated states Daihatsu Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Daihatsu-cho Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-8651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Toshihisa c/o ADVICS CO., LTD. 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8688 / JP | 02 /
Nagaya, Junya c/o ADVICS CO., LTD. 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8688 / JP | 03 /
Yakushijin, Tokio c/o DAIHATSU MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Daihatsu-cho Ikeda-shi Osaka 563-8651 / JP | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09178686.3 | 28.07.2003 | [2010/12] | Priority number, date | JP20020228367 | 06.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002228367 | JP20020228373 | 06.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002228373 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2165895 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2165895 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/1755 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
B60T8/172 (EP,US);
B60T8/171 (EP,US);
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60T2230/03 (EP,US);
B60T2250/04 (EP,US);
B60T2260/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | B60T8/00, B60R21/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/12] | Title | German: | Bewegungssteuervorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug | [2010/12] | English: | Motion control apparatus for a vehicle | [2010/12] | French: | Appareil de contrôle des mouvements pour véhicule | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 24.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03766642.7 / EP1535815 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030766642) is 23.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19830189 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 66 - page 3, line 65 *; | [Y]US6081761 (HARADA MASAHARU [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * column 13, line 3 - column 13, line 30; figure 12 *; | [A]EP1046571 (DLR EV [DE]) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] *; | [Y]US6139120 (FUKADA YOSHIKI [JP]) [Y] 5 * column 8, line 4 - column 8, line 14 *; | [XY]US6178368 (OTAKE HIROTADA [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 52; figure 1 * [Y] 4-5; | [A]DE10128692 (HINO JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 52 - column 7, line 26 * | by applicant | US6178368 |