EP2208776 - Bleaching compositions containing perfume microcapsules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bianchetti, Giulia Ottavia Via Catarina Troiani 250 00144 Rome / IT | 02 /
Evers, Marc Francois Theophile Lakensestraat 37 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 03 /
Smets, Johan Bollenberg 79 3210 Lubbeek / BE | 04 /
Grande, Giovanni Via Giuditta Rissone 39/A 00125 Rome / IT | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Kellenberger, Jakob NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Kellenberger, Jakob NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2010/29] | Goodier, Claire-Louise NV Procter & Gamble Services SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 09178791.1 | 11.12.2009 | [2010/29] | Priority number, date | EP20090150730 | 16.01.2009 Original published format: EP 09150730 | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2208776 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39, C11D3/50 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
C11D3/3947 (EP,US);
C11D3/2065 (EP,US);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C11D3/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | Bleichzusammensetzung mit Parfümmikrokapseln | [2010/29] | English: | Bleaching compositions containing perfume microcapsules | [2010/29] | French: | Composition de blanchiment contenant des microcapsules de parfum | [2010/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 05.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5441660 (TSAUR LIANG S [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 9, line 4 - line 5; claim 9 *; | [A]EP1122299 (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL]) [A] 1-10* claims 1-10 *; | [Y]EP1396536 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] *; | [A]US2004071742 (POPPLEWELL LEWIS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP1721963 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2007038570 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * examples 7-9,12 * | Examination | DE19855349 |