EP2157280 - Gas turbine rotor blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama 220-8401 / JP | [2015/16] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukue, Ichiro Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Akita, Eiji Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Suenaga, Kiyoshi Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Tomita, Yasuoki Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2015/49] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
Fukue, Ichiro Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Akita, Eiji Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Suenaga, Kiyoshi Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Tomita, Yasuoki Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/08] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09178798.6 | 01.02.1999 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | JP19980023305 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2330598 | JP19980023306 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2330698 | JP19980023307 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2330798 | JP19980032874 | 16.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3287498 | JP19980032875 | 16.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3287598 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2157280 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2157280 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2157280 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
F05D2260/22141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [2015/49] |
Former [2010/08] | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Gasturbinenlaufschaufel | [2010/08] | English: | Gas turbine rotor blade | [2010/08] | French: | Aube rotorique pour turbine à gaz | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 16.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03025023.7 / EP1391581 | EP99102032.2 / EP0935052 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990102032) is 28.07.2003 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.12.2015 | GB | 02.03.2016 | [2017/08] |
Former [2016/36] | IT | 02.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB872705 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 14 - line 37; figures 6-8 *; | [XA]JPS5847104 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 5-8 *[A] 2; | [Y]GB1605335 (ROLLS ROYCE) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 26 - line 112; figures 2-6 * | by applicant | GB872705 | JPS5847104 | GB1605335 |