EP2196713 - Device, method and kit of parts for forming a press-fit connection with a tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conex Universal Limited Whitehall Road Tipton West Midlands DY4 7JU / GB | [2011/50] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states IBP Conex Limited Whitehall Road Tipton West Midlands DY4 7JU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glaze, Alan Richard 10 Brook Fields Close Marlbrook Bromsgrove, Worcestershire B60 IEP / GB | 02 /
Webb, Steven Paul 9 Horseley Rd. Tipton, West Midlands DY4 7LX / GB | [2012/24] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
Glaze, Alan Richard 10 Brook Fields Close Marlbrook Bromsgrove, Worcestershire B60 IEP / GB | ||
02 /
Webb, Steven Paul 9 Horseley Rd. Tipton, West Midlands DY4 7LX / GB | Representative(s) | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, et al Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2012/24] |
Former [2010/46] | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, et al Jones Day Hochhaus am Park Grüneburgweg 102 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2010/24] | van Lookeren Campagne, Constantijn August Jones Day Hochhaus am Park Grüneburgweg 102 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09178912.3 | 11.12.2009 | [2010/24] | Priority number, date | EP20080021611 | 12.12.2008 Original published format: EP 08021611 | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196713 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2196713 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/14 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
F16L13/142 (EP,US);
F16L13/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Verfahren und Teilesatz zum Bilden einer Pressverbindung mit einem Rohr | [2010/24] | English: | Device, method and kit of parts for forming a press-fit connection with a tube | [2010/24] | French: | Dispositif, procédé et kit de pièces pour former un raccord de sertissage avec un tuyau | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 12.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.2013
18.03.2013
ADMISSIBLE Viega Holding GmbH & Co. KG Viega Platz 1 57439 Attendorn / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack, et al, et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/39] |
Former [2016/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.2013
18.03.2013
ADMISSIBLE Viega GmbH & Co. KG Viega Platz 1 57439 Attendorn / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack, et al, et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2013/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.2013
18.03.2013
ADMISSIBLE Viega GmbH & Co. KG Viega Platz 1 57439 Attendorn / DE Opponent's representative Krüger, Jérôme, et al, et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2013/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.2013
Viega GmbH & Co. KG Viega Platz 1 57439 Attendorn / DE | 19.04.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.10.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.03.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/44] | 16.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 12.02.2015 | Appeal received No. T0315/15 | 13.04.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 13.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.03.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2009 | AT | 13.06.2012 | BE | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | HR | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | MK | 13.06.2012 | MT | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | SM | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | NO | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | IE | 11.12.2012 | LU | 11.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | PT | 11.06.2014 | [2019/40] |
Former [2015/32] | HU | 11.12.2009 | |
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
LU | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | HU | 11.12.2009 | |
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
LU | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | HU | 11.12.2009 | |
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
LU | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 11.12.2009 | |
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
LU | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
LU | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | |
NO | 13.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102006050427 (KLAUKE GMBH GUSTAV [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0080] , [0086]; figures 9,17 * [Y] 4,8-9 [I] 5; | [XY]EP1167853 (ITAP SPA [IT]) [X] 1,6-7,10-15 * paragraph [0027]; figure 3b * [Y] 4,8-9; | [YD]EP1847753 (IBP CONEX LTD [GB]) [YD] 4,8-9 * abstract *; | [AD]EP1431643 (FRANZ VIEGENER II GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 32,33 * | by applicant | EP1431643 | EP1167853 | DE102006050427 | EP1847753 |