29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
27.04.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
19.05.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.01.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2012 |
First examination report |
|
03.10.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.09.2010 |
Publication of search report |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
28.05.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |
28.05.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |