Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8111590 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2012 | B2 | US2010165797 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008334197 | 26.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4678056B | Global Dossier | 27.04.2011 | B2 | JP2010156586 | 15.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008334197 | 26.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2202591 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2017 | B1 | EP2202591 | 06.10.2010 | A3 | EP2202591 | 30.06.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008334197 | 26.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101770204B | 23.05.2012 | B | CN101770204 | 07.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008334197 | 26.12.2008 |