EP2202591 - Electronic timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asami, Yoshinori c/o Intellectual Property Department, Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 02 /
Kasuo, Tomoo c/o Intellectual Property Department, Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | [2017/25] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
Asami, Yoshinori c/o Intellectual Property Department, Casio Computer Co., Ltd., Hamura R&D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
Kasuo, Tomoo c/o Intellectual Property Department, Casio Computer Co., Ltd., Hamura R&D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/25] |
Former [2010/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09178997.4 | 14.12.2009 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | JP20080334197 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008334197 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2202591 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2202591 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2202591 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G04C10/02, G04G19/10 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
G04C10/02 (EP,US);
G04G19/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Uhr | [2010/26] | English: | Electronic timepiece | [2010/26] | French: | Pièce d'horlogerie électronique | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 25.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2009 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | IT | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | MK | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | SM | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | NO | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | IE | 14.12.2017 | LU | 14.12.2017 | MT | 14.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
MT | 14.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
MT | 14.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
MT | 14.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
MT | 14.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
MT | 14.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
MT | 14.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
MT | 14.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
MT | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.12.2017 | ||
MT | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0241219 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [I] 1-6 * column 4 - column 6; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2671646 (GORGY TIMING [FR], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 37 *; | [A]EP1873594 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |