EP2199607 - Planetary gear for a wind power system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/33] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Winergy AG Am Industriepark 2 46562 Voerde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dinter, Ralf Martin Bulmkerstr. 111 A 45888 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 02 /
Möllers, Manfred Hitzestr. 81 46399 Bocholt / DE | 03 /
Scheibe, Herbert Sigmund-Freud-Platz 4 46397 Bocholt / DE | [2013/39] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Dinter, Ralf Martin Bulmkerstr. 111 A 45888 Gelsenkirchen / DE | ||
02 /
Möllers, Manfred Hitzestr. 81 46399 Bocholt / DE | |||
03 /
Scheibe, Herbert Sigmund-Freud-Platz 4 46397 Bocholt / DE | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/08] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP S, Mch P Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09179029.5 | 14.12.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | DE20081063868 | 19.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008063868 | [2010/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2199607 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2199607 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199607 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00, F03D11/02, F16H1/28 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
F16H57/0482 (EP,US);
F03D15/00 (EP,US);
F03D15/10 (EP,US);
F03D80/00 (EP,US);
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
F16H57/0427 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | Planetengetriebe für eine Windkraftanlage | [2010/25] | English: | Planetary gear for a wind power system | [2010/25] | French: | Train épicycloïdal pour une éolienne | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 08.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2009 | BG | 25.09.2013 | CY | 25.09.2013 | CZ | 25.09.2013 | DK | 25.09.2013 | EE | 25.09.2013 | FI | 25.09.2013 | HR | 25.09.2013 | LT | 25.09.2013 | LV | 25.09.2013 | MC | 25.09.2013 | MK | 25.09.2013 | MT | 25.09.2013 | NL | 25.09.2013 | PL | 25.09.2013 | RO | 25.09.2013 | SI | 25.09.2013 | SK | 25.09.2013 | SM | 25.09.2013 | TR | 25.09.2013 | IE | 14.12.2013 | LU | 14.12.2013 | NO | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | IS | 25.01.2014 | PT | 27.01.2014 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
TR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
TR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.12.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
LU | 14.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CZ | 25.09.2013 | |
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CZ | 25.09.2013 | |
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.09.2013 | |
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 25.09.2013 | |
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 25.09.2013 | |
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 25.09.2013 | |
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10260132 (WINERGY AG [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP1703174 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO0144695 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1184567 (RENK AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |