EP2336196 - Treatment of lignocellulosic feed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Von Hebel, Klaas Lambertus Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Van der Heide, Evert Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Mackay, Munro Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | 04 /
Zhang, Ting Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 09179756.3 | 17.12.2009 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2336196 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, C08H8/00, D21C3/20 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
C08H8/00 (EP);
C08B37/0003 (EP);
C08B37/0057 (EP);
D21C11/0007 (EP);
D21C3/04 (EP);
D21C3/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Behandlung von Lignocellulose-Futtermittel | [2011/25] | English: | Treatment of lignocellulosic feed | [2011/25] | French: | Traitement d' aliments lignocellulosiques | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007120210 (NATUREWORKS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2009080737 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 4; claim - *; | [I]WO9726403 (ESA ROUSU CONSULTING OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 4, line 4 - line 9 * * page 10, line 3 - line 11 * * page 10, line 16 - line 18 * * page 11, line 11 - line 22 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 5 * * figure 1 * |