EP2202864 - Charger for electronic device, electronic device, and charging method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2015/36] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Takahiro nikon Corporation Intellectual Property Headquarter 2-3-, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09180106.8 | 21.12.2009 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | JP20080331509 | 25.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008331509 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2202864 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2202864 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
H02J7/342 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ladegerät für ein elektronisches Gerät, elektronisches Gerät und Ladeverfahren | [2010/26] | English: | Charger for electronic device, electronic device, and charging method | [2010/26] | French: | Chargeur pour dispositif électronique, dispositif électronique et procédé de chargement | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 13.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007120531 (HUH SAE H [KR]) [X] 1,15,16 * paragraphs [0009] - [0016] - [0043] - [0055]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 3-5 [I] 6-14; | [X]EP1821384 (SUMMIT MICROELECTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,15,16 * paragraphs [0049] , [0056] , [0063]; figures 1,2,5,7 *; | [Y]US2008258688 (HUSSAIN M ABID [US], et al) [Y] 3-5* paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *; | [XP]US2009009187 (KWAK DONG HOON [KR]) [XP] 1-16 * figures 4,5 * | by applicant | JP2006243863 |