EP2221385 - Deubiquination assays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogel, Kurt William 18 Haverhill Circle Madison, WI 53717 / US | 02 /
Riddle, Steven Michael 6005 Mayhill Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | 03 /
Horton, Robert Aron 17 Regis Circle Madison, WI 53711 / US | 04 /
Robers, Matthew Brian 14 Oak Glen Court Madison, WI 53717 / US | 05 /
Michaud, Gregory Allen 25 Cranberry Circle Stow, MA 01775 / US | 06 /
Machleidt, Thomas 6401 Landfall Drive Madison, WI 53705 / US | 07 /
Vedvik, Kevin 1444 Prairie Rose Drive Sun Prairie, WI 53590 / US | 08 /
Huwiler, Kristin G. 14 Oak Glen Court Madison, WI 53717 / US | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Irvine, Jonquil Claire, et al HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Irvine, Jonquil Claire, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2010/34] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09180259.5 | 30.10.2006 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | US20050731310P | 28.10.2005 Original published format: US 731310 P | US20050735812P | 14.11.2005 Original published format: US 735812 P | US20060759545P | 18.01.2006 Original published format: US 759545 P | US20060774236P | 17.02.2006 Original published format: US 774236 P | US20060832114P | 21.07.2006 Original published format: US 832114 P | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2221385 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2221385 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/37, G01N33/542 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/542 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | Deubiquinations-Assays | [2010/34] | English: | Deubiquination assays | [2010/34] | French: | Dosages de l'activité déubiquitination | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 08.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06839622.5 / EP1955071 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060839622) is 23.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2004020458 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1,3-7,15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 34, line 25 - page 36, line 19 * * page 58, line 14 - line 21 * * claims 1-7 * [Y] 2,8; | [XY]WO02066982 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * claims 1-7,15-23,47-51 * * page 8, line 15 - line 31 * [Y] 2,8; | [Y]WO2005026730 (INVITROGEN CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2,8 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 20, line 1 - line 15 * * page 2, line 1 - line 11 * |