EP2203000 - Adaptive feedback gain correction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN ReSound A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2015/49] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states GN Resound A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Der Werf, Erik Cornelis Diederik Venbergsemolen 211 5612 DZ Eindhoven / NL | [2015/48] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
Van Der Werf, Erik Cornelis Diederik Salderes 216 5682 EX Best / NL | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2015/49] |
Former [2014/17] | Jakobsen, Gert Høy, et al Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | ||
Former [2012/11] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2010/26] | Jakobsen, Gert Hoey Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 09180287.6 | 22.12.2009 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | DK20080001839 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: DK 200801839 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203000 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2203000 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
H04R25/453 (EP,US);
H04R25/305 (EP);
H04R25/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Adaptive Verstärkungsrückkopplungskorrektur | [2010/26] | English: | Adaptive feedback gain correction | [2010/26] | French: | Correction adaptatif de gain de rétroaction | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2009 | AT | 02.12.2015 | BE | 02.12.2015 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | ES | 02.12.2015 | FI | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | IT | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MC | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | MT | 02.12.2015 | NL | 02.12.2015 | PL | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | SE | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | IE | 22.12.2015 | LU | 22.12.2015 | NO | 02.03.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | PT | 04.04.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1439736 (GN RESOUND AS [DK]) [X] 1-6,13-15 * paragraphs [0051] , [0089] , [0092] * * figure 17 * [I] 12; | [XI]US6876751 (GAO SHAWN X [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13-15 * abstract * * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 22 * * column 14, line 1 - line 15; figures 18,19 * [I] 12; | [XI]EP1830602 (PHONAK AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * [I] 12; | [XI]EP1191814 (TOEPHOLM & WESTERMANN [DK]) [X] 1-6,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0105]; figures 1,3 * [I] 12; | [A]US5619580 (HANSEN ROY S [DK]) [A] 1-6,12-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO03015468 |