EP2169637 - Coin bar storage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laurel Precision Machines Co., Ltd. 12-5, Nishi-Shinsaibashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Laurel Precision Machines Co. Ltd. 12-5, nishi-Shinsaibashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakai, Keiji c/o LAUREL PRECISION MACHINES CO., LTD Tokyo Laboratory 1-12-6, Higashitabata Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hibari Eiko c/o LAUREL PRECISION MACHINES CO., LTD Tokyo Laboratory 1-12-6, Higashitabata Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
Sakai, Keiji c/o LAUREL PRECISION MACHINES CO., LTD Tokyo Laboratory 1-12-6, Higashitabata Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Hibari Eiko c/o LAUREL PRECISION MACHINES CO., LTD Tokyo Laboratory 1-12-6, Higashitabata Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2010/13] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09180442.7 | 05.02.2008 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | JP20070028474 | 07.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007028474 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169637 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2169637 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G07D1/06, G07D9/02, G07G1/00 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
G07D1/06 (EP,KR,US);
G07D9/02 (EP,KR,US);
G07G1/0027 (EP,KR,US);
G07D2201/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Münzstangen-Aufbewahrung | [2010/13] | English: | Coin bar storage | [2010/13] | French: | Stockage de barre de pièces de monnaie | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08151061.2 / EP1956562 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080151061) is 03.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2008 | AT | 19.06.2013 | BE | 19.06.2013 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | HR | 19.06.2013 | IT | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | MT | 19.06.2013 | NL | 19.06.2013 | PL | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | NO | 19.09.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | ES | 30.09.2013 | IS | 19.10.2013 | PT | 21.10.2013 | IE | 05.02.2014 | LU | 05.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.02.2008 | |
AT | 19.06.2013 | ||
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 05.02.2014 | ||
LU | 05.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 05.02.2014 | ||
LU | 05.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 05.02.2014 | ||
LU | 05.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
LU | 05.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
LU | 05.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
NO | 19.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006109400 (GLORY KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-7; | EP1879155 [ ] (GLORY KOGYO KK [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-4,6 *; | [A]EP0724242 (PERCELL GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 31 - column 11, line 31 * * figures 1-3,5,6 *; | [A]FR2586840 (LEROY GERARD [FR]) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 34 - page 3, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO03079299 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 8 * * page 7, line 19 - page 9, line 18 * | by applicant | JP2007028474 | JP2006085332 |