EP2341618 - Piezo-resistive MEMS resonator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koops, Gerhard NXP Semiconductors IP Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | 02 /
Van Beek, Jozef Thomas Martinus NXP Semiconductors IP Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Williamson, Paul Lewis NXP Semiconductors IP Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09180585.3 | 23.12.2009 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341618 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02, H03H3/007 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
H03H3/0072 (EP,US);
H10N30/082 (US);
H03H9/02259 (EP,US);
Y10S977/762 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Piezoresistiver MEMS-Resonator | [2011/27] | English: | Piezo-resistive MEMS resonator | [2011/27] | French: | Résonateur MEMS piézorésistif | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees DE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 09.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 09.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008314148 (ROBERT PHILIPPE [FR]); |