EP2202954 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURING A FAX TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/26] | Method for securing the sending of a facsimile and corresponding device | ||
[2010/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGEMCOM DOCUMENTS SAS 250 Route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states SAGEMCOM DOCUMENTS SAS 250 Route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS SAS 250 route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lefranc, Pascal Route de l'Empereur, 250 92500, Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25, rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 10 rue de la Pépinière 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09180774.3 | 24.12.2009 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | FR20080059094 | 29.12.2008 Original published format: FR 0859094 | [2010/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2202954 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2202954 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
H04N1/32117 (EP);
H04N2201/3218 (EP);
H04N2201/3219 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren für sichere Faksimileübertragung | [2010/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURING A FAX TRANSMISSION | [2010/42] | French: | Procédé de sécurisation d'un envoi de facsimile et dispositif associé | [2010/26] |
Former [2010/26] | Sicherungsverfahren eines Faxversands und entsprechende Vorrichtung | ||
Former [2010/26] | Method for securing the sending of a facsimile and corresponding device | Examination procedure | 24.12.2009 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 24.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 03.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9610314 (CAIRO JERRY [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2008117473 (JULIANO CORNELL [US]) [A] 4,5 * abstract * |