EP2341176 - Laundry washing machine with steam-based clothes refreshing cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruffati, Gisella Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
Bondi, Martino Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Nardoni, Andrea, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Nardoni, Andrea, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 09180842.8 | 29.12.2009 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341176 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D06F35/00, D06F39/08, D06F39/00 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
D06F39/088 (EP,US);
D06F35/006 (EP,US);
D06F39/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Waschmaschine mit Dampf-Verfahren zum Auffrischen von Kleidern | [2011/27] | English: | Laundry washing machine with steam-based clothes refreshing cycle | [2011/27] | French: | Machine à laver le linge avec procédé à base de vapeur pour rafraîchir des vêtements | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0523493 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-6,9-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP0628651 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) [A] 1,7-10 * column 3, line 22 - column 6, line 39 ** column 7, lines 17-21; figure - *; | [AD]EP1275767 (V ZUG AG [CH]) [AD] 1,4-6,9,10,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006005581 (BANBA YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,9,10,13 * paragraphs [0002] - [0013] - [0046] , [0049] - [0052] - [0059] - [0060] - [0069] , [0073] , [0074]; figures 1-5 *; | [YDA]WO2006129912 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [YD] 6-8 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,9-13; | [XY]DE102007041906 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-5,9-13 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8 | by applicant | CH695383 | WO2006129912 |