EP2204499 - Excavator machine with a kelly equipped with cavities opening on two faces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soletanche Freyssinet 133 Boulevard National 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chagnot, Philippe c/o Soletanche Freyssinet 133 Boulevard National 92500, Rueil Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Bernasinski, Régis c/o Soletanche Freyssinet 133 Boulevard National 92500, Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2011/35] |
Former [2010/27] | 01 /
Chagnot, Philippe c/o Soletanche Freyssinet 133 Boulevard National 92500, Rueil Malmaison / FR | ||
02 /
Bernasinski, Régis c/o Soletanche Freyssinet 133 Boulevard National 92500, Rueil Malmaison / FR | Representative(s) | Balesta, Pierre, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Balesta, Pierre, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09180860.0 | 29.12.2009 | [2010/27] | Priority number, date | FR20080059114 | 30.12.2008 Original published format: FR 0859114 | [2010/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2204499 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2204499 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E02D7/16, E21B15/00, E02D13/04 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
E02D7/16 (EP);
E02D13/04 (EP);
E21B19/083 (EP);
E02D17/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | Aushubmaschine mit einem Kellygestänge mit Aussparungen, die nach zwei Seiten geöffnet sind | [2010/27] | English: | Excavator machine with a kelly equipped with cavities opening on two faces | [2010/27] | French: | Machine d'excavation ayant un kelly muni de cavités débouchant sur deux faces | [2010/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 12.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2011 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | DK | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | FI | 31.08.2011 | HR | 31.08.2011 | HU | 31.08.2011 | IE | 31.08.2011 | LT | 31.08.2011 | LV | 31.08.2011 | MK | 31.08.2011 | MT | 31.08.2011 | NL | 31.08.2011 | PL | 31.08.2011 | RO | 31.08.2011 | SE | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | SM | 31.08.2011 | TR | 31.08.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | NO | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | ES | 11.12.2011 | LU | 29.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | IS | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | PT | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
SM | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
LU | 29.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
SM | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
LU | 29.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
SM | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
LU | 29.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
SM | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3642387 (DELMAG MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [X] 1-2 * columns 6,7; figures 1,4,5 * [A] 3-12; | [A]JPH0258627 (NIPPON SHARYO SEIZO KK) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0790845 (KINKI ISHIKO KK) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,8 *; | [A]JP2003013449 (NIPPON SHARYO SEIZO KK) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2382092 (CIE DU SOL [FR], et al) [A] 1-12* figures 4,4a,4b *; | [A]EP1471187 (CIE DU SOL [FR]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006041154 (KATAOKA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,4,5 *; | [AD]FR2888859 (CIE DU SOL SOC CIV ILE [FR]) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3642387 | FR2888859 |