EP2341086 - Bopp-film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gloger, Dietrich Landstrasse 24 4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
Klimke, Katja Pfarrplatz 13 4020 Linz / AT | 03 /
Fiebig, Joachim Oberschöfring 12 4502 St. Marien / AT | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Lux, Berthold Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Lux, Berthold Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09181011.9 | 30.12.2009 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341086 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F110/06, H01B3/44, B32B27/32 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F10/06 (KR,US);
B32B27/32 (KR);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
H01B3/44 (KR);
H01B3/441 (EP,US);
C08F2410/01 (EP,US);
C08F2500/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65927 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/20, C08F2500/19, C08F2500/26 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOPP-Folie | [2011/27] | English: | Bopp-film | [2011/27] | French: | Film BOPP | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/27] | 17.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004010087 (OBATA YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,12,13 * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0151] * * paragraph [0192] *; | [X]WO2006125672 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,9-13 * example 1; claims 1-27; table 2 *; | [X]WO2008006529 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,7,9-14 * comparative examples 1 and 2 *; | [X]WO2008135598 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-4,9-14 * comparative example 1; page 17, lines 1-10; claims 1-25 *; | [E]EP2186834 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [E] 15,16* paragraph [0213]; example 1 *; | [E]EP2192133 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [E] 15,16 * paragraph [0096]; example 3 * | by applicant | WO9212182 | WO9428034 | WO9722633 | EP0887379 | WO0148034 | WO0216455 | WO03051934 | WO2005105863 | EP1883080 | EP1990353 | - T. HAYASHI; Y. INOUE; R. CHUJO; T. ASAKURA, POLYMER, (1988), vol. 29, pages 138 - 43 | - CHUJO R ET AL., POLYMER, (1994), vol. 35, page 339 | - G. SAUNDERS; P. A. G: CORMACK; S. GRAHAM; D.; C. SHERRINGTON, MACROMOLECULES, (2005), vol. 38, pages 6418 - 6422 | - "Molecular Weight Sensitive Detectors", C. JACKSON; H. G. BARTH, Handbook of Size Exclusion Chromatography and related techniques, MARCEL DEKKER, (2004), page 103 |