EP2085994 - Safety switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Limited Pitfield, Kiln Farm Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK11 3DR / GB | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poyner, Julian 8 Haddon Road Hazel Grove Stockport Cheshire SK7 6JS / GB | 02 /
Jones, Derek Clamhan Cottage Borgue Kircudbright Dumfries and Galloway Scotland DG6 4SP / GB | 03 /
Sawyer, Derek Calle Real De Narila 16 Cadiar Granada 18448 / ES | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Bray, Richard Anthony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [2011/38] |
Former [2009/32] | Bray, Richard Anthony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 83-95 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250110.5 | 16.01.2009 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | GB20080001704 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: GB 0801704 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085994 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2085994 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01H27/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
H01H27/002 (EP,US);
H01H9/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/15] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schutzschalter | [2009/32] | English: | Safety switch | [2009/32] | French: | Interrupteur de sécurité | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 06.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2713093 (JOERNDT WILBUR A, et al) [A] 1-19* column 3, lines 27-47; figure 1 * |