EP2104342 - Image processing apparatus, method and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saturn Licensing LLC 25 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10022-3211 / US | [2017/39] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 180-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Nobuyuki Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Yabe, Toshiharu Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
Negi, Daisuke Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/14] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
Fujiwara, Nobuyuki Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
02 /
Yabe, Toshiharu Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
03 /
Negi, Daisuke Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/14] |
Former [2014/21] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Ealey, Douglas Ralph D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250335.8 | 11.02.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | JP20080068850 | 18.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008068850 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104342 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2104342 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104342 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, G06F3/048 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/440263 (EP,US);
H04N21/4438 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4728 (EP,US);
H04N21/4882 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/21] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Verfahren und Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2009/39] | English: | Image processing apparatus, method and recording medium | [2009/39] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images, procédé et support d'enregistrement | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 24.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7164714 (MARTIN FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,7,11-13 * paragraph [0059]; figure 5 * [I] 4; | [X]US2007252822 (KIM HYUN-JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,7-13 * paragraph [0093]; figures 7B, 7C *; | [XP]EP1956838 (DIRECTV GROUP INC [US]) [XP] 1-13* paragraph [0038] * | by applicant | JP2007089088 |