EP2093666 - Implant revision recognition by exchanging the revision data during transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codman Neuro Sciences Sàrl rue Girardet 29 2400 Le Locle / CH | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crivelli, Rocco Via Le Giuseppe Motta 32A 6500 Bellinzona / CH | 02 /
Ginggen, Alec 6 Murray Street Massachusetts 02360 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/35] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250414.1 | 18.02.2009 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | US20080070618 | 19.02.2008 Original published format: US 70618 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093666 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, A61N1/372 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
A61N1/37264 (EP,US);
G06F8/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | Implantatrevisionserkennung durch Austauschen der Revisionsdaten während der Übertragung | [2009/35] | English: | Implant revision recognition by exchanging the revision data during transmission | [2009/35] | French: | Reconnaissance de révision d'implant par échange de données de révision pendant la transmission | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/32] | 11.06.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.06.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/32] | Appeal following examination | 21.08.2014 | Appeal received No. T2133/14 | 21.10.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.06.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5800473 (FAISANDIER YVES [FR]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [X]WO0070889 (MEDTRONIC PHYSIO CONTROL MFG [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1,6,9,20,45 * * figures 1,4 *; | [X]WO0147597 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 4 * * claims 1,3-5,15,18 *; | [X]US2005240246 (LEE MICHAEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1,13,14 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0019] , [0026] , [0031] , [0032] , [0036] , [0037] , [0039] , [0040] , [0048] , [0051] * | by applicant | US5800473 |