EP2107784 - Image data generating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otsuka, Naoki c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2018/01] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
Otsuka, Naoki c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1-1 Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/41] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250666.6 | 10.03.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | JP20080089614 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008089614 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2107784 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2107784 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2107784 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/04 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
H04N1/04 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0414 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/07] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bilddatenerstellungsvorrichtung | [2009/41] | English: | Image data generating device | [2009/41] | French: | Dispositif de génération de données d'image | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 30.12.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6671421 (OGATA TAKEFUSA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004146218 (TINN GRAHAM JAMES OHN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2001245133 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004169870 (AHMED MOHAMED N [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007070445 (CHELVAYOHAN MAHESAN [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0591974 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2006333162 | JP2005079816 |