EP2128365 - Fitting for panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optima Contracting Limited 57 London Road High Wycombe HP11 1BS / GB | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charlton, John Compton, Back Lane, Spurstow Tarporley, Cheshire CW6 9TE / GB | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250734.2 | 16.03.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | GB20080009784 | 29.05.2008 Original published format: GB 0809784 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2128365 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2128365 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/04, E05D5/02 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
E05D5/0246 (EP,GB);
E05B65/0025 (EP);
E05D7/04 (EP);
E05D7/0415 (GB);
F16B5/025 (GB);
E05D7/081 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2014/42] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halterung für Paneele | [2009/49] | English: | Fitting for panels | [2009/49] | French: | Structure de fixation pour panneaux | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 10.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9634169 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [XY]DE20116811U (HAHN RAINER [DE]); | [Y]DE20119264U (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) |