EP2139040 - Organic transistor array, display device and method of fabricating display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transcend Optronics (Yangzhou) Co., Ltd. No. 8, Wuzhou West Rd. Economic Development Zone Yangzhou / CN | [2021/04] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states Tianma Micro-Electronics Co., Ltd. 22f, Hangdu Building,Shennan Road Futian District Shenzhen / CN | ||
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Tianma Micro-Electronics Co., Ltd. 22f, Hangdu Building,Shennan Road Futian District Shenzen / CN | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yutani, Keiichiro 5-18-14-301, Edaminami Tsuzuki-ku Yokohoma-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Yamaga, Takumi 1-14-16-103, Kamoi Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Onodera, Atsushi 25-15-401, Miyamotocho Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [2020/16] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
Yutani, Keiichiro 5-18-14-301, Edaminami Tsuzuki-ku Yokohoma-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Yamaga, Takumi 1-14-16-103, Kamoi Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Onodera, Atsushi 25-15-401, Miyamotocho Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Round, Edward Mark, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09251639.2 | 24.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | JP20080166329 | 25.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008166329 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139040 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139040 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/28, H01L27/32, G02F1/1362, H01L51/00, H01L51/05, G02F1/1368 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
H10K19/10 (EP,US);
H10K59/125 (EP,US);
G02F1/1368 (EP,US);
H10K10/464 (EP,US);
H10K59/127 (EP,US);
H10K59/131 (EP,US);
H10K71/135 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | H01L27/28, H01L27/32, G02F1/1362 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/16] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Organisches Transistorarray, Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Anzeigevorrichtung | [2010/01] | English: | Organic transistor array, display device and method of fabricating display device | [2010/01] | French: | Réseau de transistors organiques, dispositif d'affichage et procédé de fabrication du dispositif d'affichage | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 17.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2009 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | IT | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | IE | 24.06.2020 | LU | 24.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.06.2009 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 24.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 24.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 24.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 24.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 15.04.2020 | |
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0158366 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]EP0498498 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [Y]EP1450587 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2004238816 (TANO TAKANORI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1868246 (PIONEER CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2008015947 (RICOH KK [JP], et al); | by applicant | JP2005310962 | JP2007036259 |