EP2151553 - HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/06] | Honeycomb structure | ||
[2015/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [2016/16] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogura, Yutaka c/o Legal Affairs & Intellectual Property Dept. NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya 467-8530 / JP | [2016/15] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
Ogura, Yutaka c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi-ken, 467-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/16] |
Former [2010/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09251777.0 | 10.07.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | JP20080204286 | 07.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008204286 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151553 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2151553 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/00, C04B111/00, F01N3/022, B01D46/24 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
C04B38/0016 (EP,US);
B01D46/2451 (EP,US);
B01D46/2474 (EP,US);
B01D46/2478 (EP,US);
B01D46/2482 (EP,US);
B01D46/2498 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
B01D2279/30 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24157 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24165 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0016, C04B35/565, C04B38/0009, C04B41/4507 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | F01N3/022, B01D46/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WABENSTRUKTUR | [2015/49] | English: | HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE | [2015/49] | French: | STRUCTURE EN NID D'ABEILLE | [2015/49] |
Former [2010/06] | Wabenstruktur | ||
Former [2010/06] | Honeycomb structure | ||
Former [2010/06] | Structure en nid d'abeille | Examination procedure | 09.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2009 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | IE | 10.07.2016 | LU | 10.07.2016 | GB | 20.07.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 10.07.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.07.2016 | ||
LU | 10.07.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 10.07.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.07.2016 | ||
LU | 10.07.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.07.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.07.2016 | ||
LU | 10.07.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.07.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.07.2016 | ||
LU | 10.07.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.07.2016 | ||
LU | 10.07.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1591431 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, paragraph 8 - paragraph 10 * * page 4, paragraph 15 - paragraph 18 * * page 6, paragraph 35 - page 7, paragraph 42; figures 1-6; examples 1, 2, 3; table 1 *; | [Y]EP1704908 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, paragraph 10 - paragraph 13; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AP]EP1965047 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 10 - page 3, paragraph 18 ** page 10 - paragraph 85; figures 1-6 * | Examination | EP1366792 | by applicant | JP2003291054 |