Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
01.08.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.05.2014 | Change - designated states | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
11.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.10.2013 | Publication of search report | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
18.10.2013 | Change - classification | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
18.10.2013 | Change - classification | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
30.07.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.07.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.07.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.01.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
01.01.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |