|
07.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
04.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
13.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |