Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9883880 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2018 | B2 | US2015164524 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201061424251 | 17.12.2010 | US31640410 | 23.03.2010 | US8599708 | 04.08.2008 | US51161409 | 29.07.2009 | US201113047930 | 15.03.2011 | US201514635408 | 02.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8968355 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2015 | B2 | US2011184459 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201061424251 | 17.12.2010 | US31640410 | 23.03.2010 | US8599708 | 04.08.2008 | US51161409 | 29.07.2009 | US201113047930 | 15.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2368502 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2015 | A3 | EP2368502 | 28.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201061424251 | 17.12.2010 | US31640410 | 23.03.2010 | US51161409 | 29.07.2009 | US201113047930 | 15.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8801752 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2014 | B2 | US2010030018 | 04.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8599708 | 04.08.2008 | US51161409 | 29.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010036039 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US8599708 | 04.08.2008 | US51161409 | 29.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2674520 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2016 | C | CA2674520 | 04.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8599708 | 04.08.2008 | US51161409 | 29.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009203208B | Global Dossier | 29.05.2014 | B2 | AU2009203208 | 18.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8599708 | 04.08.2008 | US51161409 | 29.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2151204 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2019 | B1 | EP2151204 | 10.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8599708 | 04.08.2008 | US51161409 | 29.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101849846B | 19.06.2013 | B | CN101849846 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US8599708 | 04.08.2008 | US51161409 | 29.07.2009 |