Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010070175 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21033608 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009212895 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21033608 | 15.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2169628 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2013 | A3 | EP2169628 | 31.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21033608 | 15.09.2008 |