EP2169628 - Method and system for providing a realistic environment for a traffic report [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERE Global B.V. Kennedyplein 222 5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states HERE Global B.V. De Run 1115 5503 LB Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states NAVTEQ B.V. De Run 1115 5503 LB Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Navteq North America, LLC 425 West Randolph Street Suite 1200 Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soulchin, Robert M. 179 Lowell Terrace King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
Swope, Howard M., III 323 Conner Drive Exton, PA 19341 / US | 03 /
Balcerzak, Michal 640 Earp Street Philadelphia, PA 19147 / US | 04 /
Carnot, Michelle L. 2935 Almond Street Philadelphia, PA 19134 / US | 05 /
Wieber, Joseph 3405 Bridlepath Road Easton, PA 18045 / US | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2010/13] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252093.1 | 28.08.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | US20080210336 | 15.09.2008 Original published format: US 210336 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2169628 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2169628 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/05, G06T11/20 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
G06T17/05 (EP,US);
G06T2215/16 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | G06T17/50, G06T11/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Bereitstellung einer realistischen Umgebung für einen Verkehrsbericht | [2010/13] | English: | Method and system for providing a realistic environment for a traffic report | [2010/13] | French: | Procédé et système pour la fourniture d'un environnement réaliste pour un rapport de trafic | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 27.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US2006247850 (CERA CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [XD] 1,10,14 * abstract * * figure 22 * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0075] * [Y] 2-9,11-13; | [Y]EP0738876 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2-9,11-13 * column 27, line 14 - line 28 *; | [A]US5757290 (WATANABE MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2008007146 (HILLMAN ROGER [SE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | US7116326 | US2004143385 | US2006247850 |