EP2172893 - Scheduling the display of content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Keiko c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252136.8 | 04.09.2009 | [2010/14] | Priority number, date | JP20080254609 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008254609 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2172893 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2172893 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N21/26225 (EP,US);
H04N21/26258 (EP,US);
H04N21/41415 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zeitplanung der Darstellung von Inhalten | [2010/14] | English: | Scheduling the display of content | [2010/14] | French: | Planification de l'affichage de contenus | [2010/14] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/14] | 26.02.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.03.2013 | 11.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006287913 (BALUJA SHUMEET [US]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]US2002095334 (KAO TZE CHUNG [US]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]WO0051102 (DHJ MEDIA AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-6 * the whole document * | [I] - POPAI Digital Signage Standards Committee, "POPAI Digital Signage Group Standard Terminology", (20051017), URL: http://popai.com/docs/DS/POPAI%20DigSignage%20Standard%20TermsRev%201_0.pdf, (20111205), XP002665106 [I] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2006287913 | US2002095334 | WO0051102 |