EP2319334 - A smoking system having a liquid storage portion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thorens, Michel Les Combremonts 24 1510 Moudon / CH | 02 /
Flick, Jean-Marc Rue de la Poste 3 1405 Pomy / CH | 03 /
Cochand, Oliver Yves Faubourg 30 2056 Dombresson / CH | 04 /
Dubief, Flavien Rue du Rocher 52 2000 Neuchatel / CH | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Bradford, Victoria Sophie Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Bradford, Victoria Sophie Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252490.9 | 27.10.2009 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319334 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP,US);
A24F40/44 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A24F47/00 (EA);
A24B15/167 (KR);
A24F40/10 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A24F40/40 (KR);
A24F40/42 (KR);
A24F40/46 (KR);
A24F40/485 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A61M11/042 (EP,US);
H05B1/0202 (US);
H05B1/0244 (US);
H05B3/0014 (US);
A61M11/002 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rauchsystem mit einem Flüssigkeitsspeicherteil | [2011/19] | English: | A smoking system having a liquid storage portion | [2011/19] | French: | Système de fumage ayant une partie de stockage de liquide | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 17.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3200819 (GILBERT HERBERT A); | [X]US4765347 (SENSABAUGH JR ANDREW J [US], et al); | [XY]EP0845220 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | [X]EP0893071 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | [XAY]US5935975 (ROSE JED R [US], et al); | [X]US2004099266 (CROSS STEPHEN [US], et al); | [X]US2008092912 (ROBINSON JOHN HOWARD [US], et al); | [E]EP2113178 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) | by applicant | WO2007078273 |