EP2320569 - Electrostatic discharge protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA 39 Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 1228 Plan-les-Ouates Geneva / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Notermans, Guido Im Tiergarten 40 Zurich / CH | 02 /
Maksimovic, Dejan Kampstrasse 18 8952 Schlieren / CH | 03 /
Mrcarica, Zeljko Winzerhalde 32 8049 Zurich / CH | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Gray, Peter John Bracey Thompson Gray LLP Sussex Innovation Centre Science Park Square Falmer Brighton East Sussex BN1 9SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Gray, Peter John Bracey THOMPSON GRAY LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252521.1 | 30.10.2009 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320569 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/003, H01L27/02, H02H9/04 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
H03K19/003 (EP);
H01L27/0251 (EP);
H01L27/0292 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schutz vor elektrostatischen Entladungen | [2011/19] | English: | Electrostatic discharge protection | [2011/19] | French: | Protection contre les décharges électrostatiques | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 13.01.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5442217 (MIMOTO TOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1,14 * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 21; figures 1A, 2 * * column 12, lines 1-4; figure 16 * * figure 18 * [I] 2-3,5-13; | [A]US5721656 (WU CHAU-NENG [TW], et al) [A] 1-3,5-14 * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 50-62; figure 2 *; | [A]US5693973 (NAKANO FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5-14 * figure 4 *; | [A]US5991135 (SALEH FARID [US]) [A] 1-3,5-14 * figure 3 * |