Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
03.01.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.12.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.04.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |