EP2230581 - Tactility conversion system, and method for providing tactile feedback [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rekimoto, Junichi c/o Sony Computer Science Laboratories, Inc. 3-14-13, Higashi-Gotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstrasse 62 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard Partnerschaft Amalienstrasse 62 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/38] | Malden, Nicholas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holburn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252845.4 | 21.12.2009 | [2010/38] | Priority number, date | JP20090068632 | 19.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009068632 | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2230581 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Berührungsumwandlungssystem und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Berührungsfeedback | [2010/38] | English: | Tactility conversion system, and method for providing tactile feedback | [2010/38] | French: | Système de conversion de toucher, et procédé pour fournir une réponse tactile | [2010/38] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 19.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2009068632 | - M. FUKUMOTO; T. SUGIMURA, "Active click: taciiie feedback for touch paneis", PROC. OF ACM SIGCHI, (2001), pages 121 - 122 | - I. POUPYREV; S. MARUYAMA; J. REKIMOTO, "Ambient touch: designing tactile interfaces for handheld devices", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY TABLE OF CONTENTS, (2002), pages 51 - 60 |