EP2236905 - Re-fillable apparatus for storage of compressed gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tru-Air Limited 13 Melville Street Edinburgh EH3 7PE / GB | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camilleri, Richard Lucien c/o Tru-Air Limited 13 Melville Street Edinburgh EH3 7PE / GB | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09275021.5 | 03.04.2009 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236905 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/04 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
F17C13/04 (EP);
G05D16/106 (EP);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2201/058 (EP);
F17C2203/0617 (EP);
F17C2205/0305 (EP);
F17C2205/0335 (EP);
F17C2205/0385 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP);
F17C2221/013 (EP);
F17C2221/014 (EP);
F17C2221/031 (EP);
F17C2223/0123 (EP);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/035 (EP);
F17C2223/036 (EP);
F17C2260/036 (EP);
F17C2270/025 (EP);
F17C2270/0545 (EP);
F17C2270/0563 (EP);
F17C2270/0736 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wieder auffüllbare Vorrichtung zur Aufbewahrung von verdichtetem Gas | [2010/40] | English: | Re-fillable apparatus for storage of compressed gas | [2010/40] | French: | Appareil reremplissable pour le stockage de gaz comprimé | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/45] | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO9830859 (MCMULLEN WARWICK CHARLES [AU]) [I] 1-5,9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 1; | [I]US2002096216 (GABREL STANELY [US]) [I] 1-5,9,12 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3511379 (COLEMAN CO [US]) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-14 *; | [Y]GB2182421 (ACTROL IND PTY LTD) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 120 - page 4, line 88 *; | [A]US2001050076 (COLBY DANIEL H [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 24 - column 48 *; | [A]WO9942912 (SMART PARTS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0113470 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19829124 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US4673000 (HAERR TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 46; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US3680582 (PAULIUKONIS RICHARD S) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |