EP2133652 - Mine detonating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firth, Charles Basil Old Balgowan Keig Alford AB33 8BT / GB | [2014/30] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Firth, Charles Basil 2 Airlie Steading Keig Aberdeenshire AB33 8BU / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Firth, Charles Basil 24 Bayswater Road Jesmond Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE2 3HS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne&Wear NE30 1PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth Cooper's Studios 14-18 Westgate Road Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 3NN / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 6 Charlotte Square Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 4XF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09275042.1 | 11.06.2009 | [2009/51] | Priority number, date | GB20080010643 | 11.06.2008 Original published format: GB 0810643 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2133652 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2133652 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2133652 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F41H11/30 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
F41H11/30 (EP,GB,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/51] | F41H11/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | Minenräumgerät | [2009/51] | English: | Mine detonating apparatus | [2009/51] | French: | Appareil de déminage | [2009/51] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 17.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2009 | BE | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | ES | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | LT | 13.11.2013 | LV | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | MK | 13.11.2013 | MT | 13.11.2013 | RO | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | TR | 13.11.2013 | GR | 14.02.2014 | IS | 13.03.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | GB | 11.06.2014 | LU | 11.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.06.2009 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.06.2009 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BE | 13.11.2013 | |
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | BE | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | BE | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | BE | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | BE | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | BE | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | BE | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 13.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6915728 (RENWICK PETER JOHN [GB], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 11 - line 14 * * column 1, line 19 - line 25 * * column 1, line 56 - line 67 * * column 2, line 11 - line 16 * * sentence 38 - sentence 44 *; | [A]FR1240528 (LAURENT JEAN-LUCIEN-CAMILLE) [A] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 4 - line 19 * * page 2, column 1, line 51 - line 59 * * claims 13-14 * * figures 4-6,10 *; | [A]DE2632568 (KAELBLE GMBH C) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6915728 |