Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.01.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
01.11.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.04.2011 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
18.02.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |