EP2306216 - Positioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrium Limited Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2AS / GB | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morrisson, Russell Gavin c/o Astrium Limited Anchorage Road Portsmouth Hampshire, PO3 5PU / GB | 02 /
Dixon, Charles Stephen Dr. c/o Astrium Limited Anchorage Road Portsmouth Hampshire, PO3 5PU / GB | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Bruce, Alexander Richard Henry, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | Bruce, Alexander Richard Henry, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09275089.2 | 30.09.2009 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306216 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/04, G01S1/00, G01S5/14 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
G01S1/042 (EP,US);
G01S19/11 (EP,US);
G01S5/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Positionierungssystem | [2011/14] | English: | Positioning system | [2011/14] | French: | Système de positionnement | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6101178 (BEAL ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * abstract * * columns 1-11; figures 1-5 * [Y] 8; | [A]WO2008097651 (MOBILEACCESS NETWORKS LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 3-5 * * pages 3,5-7 * * claims 1-21 *; | [XDA]US5686924 (TRIMBLE CHARLES R [US], et al) [XD] 13 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * columns 2-4 * [A] 1,12; | [XA]US6198432 (JANKY JAMES M [US]) [X] 13 * abstract * * columns 2,3; claim 1 * [A] 1,12; | [A]FR2803665 (BUISSON JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1,9,12-13 * abstract * * pages 2-5 * | [XAY] - CH. S. DIXON, R. G. MORRISON, "A Pseudolite-Based Maritime Navigation System: Concept through to Demonstration", JOURNAL OF GLOBAL POSITIONING SYSTEMS, vol. 7, no. 1, (20080131), pages 9 - 17, URL: http://www.gnss.com.au/JoGPS/v7n1/JoGPS_v7n1p9-17.pdf, (20100324), XP002574970 [X] 13-15 * the whole document * [A] 1,12 [Y] 8 | by applicant | US5686924 |