EP2242178 - Digital phase shifting for imparting a target delay on an input signal to generate an output signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amiot, Sébastien c/o NXP B.V., NXP Caen PL TV Frontend 2, rue de la Girafe 14079 Caen / FR | 02 /
Tourret, Jean-Robert c/o NXP B.V.-PS Caen BL Mainstream TV Systems Campus Effiscience, Colombelles 14906 Caen / FR | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09290277.4 | 15.04.2009 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2242178 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/13 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
H03K5/131 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Digitalphasenverschiebung zum Vermitteln einer Sollverzögerung an ein Eingangssignal, um ein Ausgangssignal zu erzeugen | [2010/42] | English: | Digital phase shifting for imparting a target delay on an input signal to generate an output signal | [2010/42] | French: | Décalage de la phase numérique pour conférer un délai cible à un signal d'entrée pour générer un signal de sortie | [2010/42] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004125905 (VLASENKO PETER [CA], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0025] - [0035] - [0039] - [0046]; figures 3,4A *; | [I]US6194928 (HEYNE PATRICK [DE]) [I] 1-20 * column 3, line 41 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-3 * |