EP2251993 - Adjustment scheme for a polarization demultiplexer in an optical dual-polarization BPSK receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weisser, Stefan Am Stadtpark 112 90409 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Leven, Andreas Oberer Markt 39a 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | 03 /
Kaneda, Noriaki 1000 Central Ave., APT. 133B 07090 Westfield, NJ / US | 04 /
Costantini, Carlo Via Ugo Foscolo 14 23880 Casatenovo (LC) / IT | 05 /
Cucchi, Silvio Via Gozzadini 35 20083 Gaggiano (MI) / IT | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/46] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09290345.9 | 11.05.2009 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251993 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251993 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/66, H04B10/67 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
H04B10/671 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/46] | H04B10/158 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Justierungsplan für einen Polarisationsdemultiplexer in einem optischen Doppelpolarisations-BPSK-Empfänger | [2010/46] | English: | Adjustment scheme for a polarization demultiplexer in an optical dual-polarization BPSK receiver | [2010/46] | French: | Schéma de réglage pour un démultiplexeur de polarisation dans un récepteur BPSK double polarisation optique | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/46] | Schéma de réglage pour un démultiplexeur de polarisation dans un récepteur BPSK ? double polarisation optique | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 28.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2009 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | HR | 10.07.2013 | IT | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | MK | 10.07.2013 | MT | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | NO | 10.10.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | ES | 21.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.05.2009 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.05.2009 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 10.07.2013 | |
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5793511 (BUELOW HENNING [DE]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 15 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 42 * * column 5, line 27 - column 5, line 67; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2051414 (CIENA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047]; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]WO0235743 (CIENA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 7, line 29 - page 9, line 7; figure 3 *; | [A] - YUNFENG SHEN ET AL, "PMDC for polarization multiplexed RZ-DQPSK systems", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION - INCUDES POST DEADLINE PAPERS, 2009. OFC 2009. CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090322), ISBN 978-1-4244-2606-5, pages 1 - 3, XP031467437 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - MARIO MARTINELLI ET AL, "Polarization Stabilization in Optical Communications Systems", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20061101), vol. 24, no. 11, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 4172 - 4183, XP011142887 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2006.884228 | by applicant | - C. RICHARD JOHNSON ET AL., "Blind Equalization Using the Constant Modulus Criterion: A Review", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (199810), vol. 86, no. 10 | - SEB J. SAVORY, "Digital filters for coherent optical receivers", OPTICAL EXPRESS, (200801), vol. 16, no. 2 | - J. R. TREICHLER ET AL., "New Processing Techniques Based on the Constant Modulus Adaptive Algorithm", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (198504), vol. ASSP-33, no. 2 | - AND- REW J. VITERBI ET AL., "Nonlinear Estimation of PSK-Modulated Carrier Phase with Application to Burst Digital Transmission", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (198307), vol. IT-29, no. 4 | EP20080290902 |