Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
04.12.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.08.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.06.2015 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
12.06.2015 | Change - German title | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
12.06.2015 | Change - English title | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
12.06.2015 | Change - French title | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
06.03.2015 | Change - German title | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
06.03.2015 | Change - English title | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
04.07.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.07.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.07.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.07.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.04.2011 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
03.02.2011 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
29.10.2010 | First examination report | |
26.10.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.09.2010 | Change - applicant | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
06.08.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
25.12.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] |