Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8518707 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2013 | B2 | US2010022019 | 28.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0804153 | 22.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2147709 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0804153 | 22.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0902383 | 20.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR0804153 | 22.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2934263 | 19.10.2012 | B1 | FR2934263 | 29.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0804153 | 22.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY150921 | 14.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0804153 | 22.07.2008 |