EP2157360 - Box with raised anti-dust pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Normalu Route de l'EDF 68680 Kembs / FR | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Jean 18, rue des Abeilles 68130 Carspach / FR | 02 /
Weit Haller, Guillaume 23, route de Colmar 68600 Dessenheim / FR | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Oudin, Stéphane JurisPatent Paris - Cabinet GUIU 28 Rue d'Aboukir 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Oudin, Stéphane JurisPatent Paris - Cabinet GUIU 28 Rue d'Aboukir 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09290636.1 | 21.08.2009 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | FR20080004673 | 22.08.2008 Original published format: FR 0804673 | [2010/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157360 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2157360 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/02, F21V1/14, E04B9/32, E04B9/00, E04B9/30 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
F21V1/14 (EP,US);
E04B9/006 (EP);
E04B9/303 (EP);
E04B9/32 (EP);
E04F13/005 (EP);
F21S8/02 (EP);
F21S8/026 (EP);
E04B2009/0492 (EP);
F21V21/04 (EP);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | Staubdichter Reliefkasten | [2010/08] | English: | Box with raised anti-dust pattern | [2010/08] | French: | Caisson en relief anti-poussière | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 23.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HR | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | IE | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | MK | 15.06.2011 | MT | 15.06.2011 | PL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | SM | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | LU | 21.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | NO | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
SM | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LU | 21.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
SM | 15.06.2011 | ||
LU | 21.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
SM | 15.06.2011 | ||
LU | 21.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
SM | 15.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
NO | 15.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2753218 (RUHLMANN RENE PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1* figure 4 *; | [A]WO0120224 (KLUTH MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 10 - line 25 * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO0120091 (KLUTH MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 3 * * page 9, line 9 - line 15 *; | [A]WO02059523 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 25 - line 28 * | by applicant | WO0120224 | WO0120091 |