EP2308896 - Polypeptides for binding to the "receptor for advanced glycation endproducts" as well as compositions and methods involving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [2011/30] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Schneider, Rudolf, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Global Intellectual Property Department Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 703 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Schneider, Rudolf, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patente Deutschland Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09290778.1 | 09.10.2009 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2308896 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, // A61K38/00 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2317/56 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
C07K2317/92 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Polypeptides zum Binden an den Rezeptor für weiterentwickelte Glykierungsendprodukte sowie Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren, die diese Polypeptide beinhalten | [2011/15] | English: | Polypeptides for binding to the "receptor for advanced glycation endproducts" as well as compositions and methods involving the same | [2011/15] | French: | Polypeptides pour liaison au récepteur des produits finaux de la glycosylation avancée et compositions et procédés les impliquant | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/37] | 27.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2011/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007109747 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2008137552 (MEDIMMUNE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9739125 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004094475 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-15 * sequence 31 * | by applicant | WO9602555 | WO0193903 | WO0193905 | WO02095027 | WO0232451 | WO0154720 | WO0213857 | AU19242001 | - NEEPER ET AL., J.BIOL.CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 14998 - 15004 | - MACCALLUM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 262, no. 5, pages 732 - 745 | - "Protein Sequence and Structure Analysis of Antibody Variable Domains", Antibody Engineering Lab Manual, SPRINGER-VERLAG | - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI.US. A., (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 |