EP2194651 - Device for biological protection against electromagnetic waves emitted by a mobile phone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dephasium Ltd 6 London Street 2nd floor London W2 1HR / GB | For all designated states Université de Nantes 1 quai de Tourville BP 13522 44035 Nantes Cedex 1 / FR | [2013/41] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Dephasium Ltd. 6 London Street 2nd floor London W2 1HR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mourali, Cyril 39, rue des Petits Champs 75001 Paris / FR | 02 /
Parienti, Serge 58-60, rue de Paris 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 03 /
Saillard, Joseph 28 rue Eugène Sue 44800 Saint Herblain / FR | 04 /
Chauveau, Janic 15 route du Gâvre 44130 Blain / FR | 05 /
Brunet, Marc 8 impasse du Silex 44450 Saint Julien de Concelles / FR | 06 /
Collette, Henri 62 rue Faidherbe 78800 Houilles / FR | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Debay, Yves Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Debay, Yves Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | ||
Former [2010/23] | Debay, Yves Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | Application number, filing date | 09290811.0 | 22.10.2009 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | FR20080005878 | 23.10.2008 Original published format: FR 0805878 | [2010/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2194651 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2194651 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, H05K9/00 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
H05K9/0052 (EP,US);
H04B1/3838 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum biologischen Schutz gegen die durch ein Mobiltelefon ausgesendeten elektromagnetischen Wellen | [2010/23] | English: | Device for biological protection against electromagnetic waves emitted by a mobile phone | [2010/23] | French: | Dispositif de protection biologique contre les ondes électromagnétiques émises par un téléphone mobile | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 17.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2009 | AT | 15.02.2012 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | HR | 15.02.2012 | IE | 15.02.2012 | LT | 15.02.2012 | LV | 15.02.2012 | MK | 15.02.2012 | MT | 15.02.2012 | PL | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | SM | 15.02.2012 | TR | 15.02.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | NO | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | IS | 15.06.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | LU | 22.10.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
SM | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
LU | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
SM | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
LU | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 15.02.2012 | |
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 15.02.2012 | |
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 15.02.2012 | |
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2363003 (DEAL ALAN ABRAHAM [GB]) [X] 1-10 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]US2002137475 (SHOU HUA-TAI [TW], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] - [0021]; figures 1,6,7 *; | [X]WO02095867 (RAYNER LANCE HAROLD [GB]) [X] 1-10 * page 13 - page 16; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE20306964U (OSTMANN HANS PETER [DE]) [A] 1* page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 8; figures 1-2 * |