EP2330746 - RRM-Driven power amplifiers in transceiver units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/37] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barth, Ulrich Lerchenstrasse 68/1 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | 02 /
Pascht, Andreas Mörikeweg 3 73635 Rudersberg / DE | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Anderlini, Alain, et al Alcatel-Lucent Bell NV Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [2011/23] | Application number, filing date | 09290907.6 | 04.12.2009 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330746 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2330746 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/04 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
H04B1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | RRM-angetriebene Leistungsverstärker in Sende-/Empfangseinheiten | [2011/23] | English: | RRM-Driven power amplifiers in transceiver units | [2011/23] | French: | Amplificateurs d'alimentation commandés par RRM dans des unités d'émetteur-récepteur | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2009 | AT | 11.09.2013 | BE | 11.09.2013 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | DK | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | ES | 11.09.2013 | FI | 11.09.2013 | HR | 11.09.2013 | IT | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | MK | 11.09.2013 | MT | 11.09.2013 | NL | 11.09.2013 | PL | 11.09.2013 | RO | 11.09.2013 | SE | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | SM | 11.09.2013 | TR | 11.09.2013 | IE | 04.12.2013 | LU | 04.12.2013 | NO | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | PT | 13.01.2014 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 04.12.2009 | |
AT | 11.09.2013 | ||
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
TR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
TR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 11.09.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | |
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 11.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5561395 (MELTON JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5903854 (ABE MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0977354 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0987817 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [XI]EP1351403 (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR [BE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1,4,5; claims 1,7,10 * [I] 2-5,7-12; | [A]US2005099222 (YANG JEFFREY M [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047]; figures 3-5 *; | [I]US2006139089 (BAMBRIDGE TIMOTHY B [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0072]; figure 9 *; | [I]US2006160504 (ICHITSUBO IKUROH [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0063]; figure 5 *; | [I]US2008102767 (CAMUFFO ANDREA [DE], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] * |